VA HB1424 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: Senate Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recounts; number permitted; tie votes. Provides that if, after a recount of an election, the recount court finds that each party to the recount has received an equal number of votes, it shall direct a determination by lot, but that no right to a recount shall be permitted. A candidate who loses a determination by lot following a recount may contest the election. The bill prohibits more than one recount of any election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recounts; number permitted, tie votes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30SenateLeft in Privileges and Elections
2018-02-20SenateContinued to 2019 in Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-01HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2018-02-01HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2018-01-31HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-30HouseRead first time
2018-01-26HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
2018-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2018-01-22HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-15HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-01-15HousePresented and ordered printed 18104141D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242674(n/a)See Bill Text
242800(n/a)See Bill Text
242802(n/a)See Bill Text
242814(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback