VA HB1421 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pollbooks; requirement for printed copies of pollbooks. Requires general registrars to produce and distribute printed copies of pollbooks to each precinct for any primary and general election. The bill also contains technical adjustments to reflect the current administrative responsibilities of the Department of Elections.
Title
Pollbooks; requirement for printed copies.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 8-N) (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 8-N) (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297) | |
2020-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 297 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1421ER) |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (89-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (89-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Gubernatorial Appointments |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102714D |