VA HB142 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Concealed handgun permits; demonstration of competence. Removes the option for concealed handgun permit applicants to demonstrate competence with a handgun by completing an electronic, video, or online course conducted by a state-certified or National Rifle Association-certified firearms instructor. The bill does not affect any in-person means of satisfying the requirement to demonstrate competence with a handgun under current law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concealed handgun permits; demonstration of competence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Public Safety
2020-02-04HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
2020-01-20HouseAssigned PS sub: Firearms
2019-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2019-12-18HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101342D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.02(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.06(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback