VA HB141 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Freedom of Information Act; personal information in constituent correspondence. Provides an exemption from the mandatory disclosure provisions of the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA) for the names, physical addresses, telephone numbers, and email addresses contained in correspondence between an individual and a member of the governing body, school board, or other public body of the locality in which the individual is a resident, unless the correspondence relates to the transaction of public business. The bill provides that no record that is otherwise open to inspection under FOIA shall be deemed exempt by virtue of the fact that it has been attached to or incorporated within any such correspondence.
Title
Freedom of Information Act; exempts personal information in constituent correspondence.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726) | |
2012-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 726 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-28 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-28 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB141ER) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 4-N) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-10 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-10 | House: Passed House (97-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House | |
2012-02-10 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-10 | House: Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-09 | House: Printed as engrossed 12100485D-E | |
2012-02-09 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB141E | |
2012-02-09 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-02-09 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-07 | House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement | |
2012-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100485D |