VA HB1409 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Second Amendment sanctuary status; budgeting decisions. Prohibits the General Assembly and the executive branch of government from considering the Second Amendment sanctuary status of any locality in the Commonwealth in making any appropriation decisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Second Amendment sanctuary status; budgeting decisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Public Safety
2020-02-04HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
2020-01-28HouseAssigned PS sub: Firearms
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102645D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback