VA HB1404 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0559)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0559)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Snakehead fish; certified restaurants and retail markets. Exempts from the prohibition against importing, possessing, transporting, purchasing, or selling any nonindigenous aquatic nuisance species without a permit any Hazard Analysis and Critical Control Point (HACCP) plan certified restaurant or retail market that purchases from an HACCP certified dealer or sells processed snakehead fish of the family Channidae.
Title
Snakehead fish; certified restaurants and retail markets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0559) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 559 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1404ER) |
2018-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18103974D |