VA HB1404 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Assistance and documentation required from localities. Provides that in any instance in which a person is seeking a business permit, a license, or an application for any similar local government approval from a locality, the locality shall provide documentation and instructions that outline all steps necessary to obtain the permit, license, or approval. The locality shall also specify any further permit, license, or other approval that may be required to complete the original project or business activity and shall disclose the expected time required by the locality for the completion of each step of the process to obtain the permit, license, or other approval.
Title
Business permit, license, etc.; timely response by localities.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2015-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2014-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2014-12-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100538D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1404 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1404+hil |