VA HB1402 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0764)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0764)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Governing boards of public institutions of higher education; leadership; residency. Requires the president or any one of the vice presidents of the board of visitors of Virginia Military Institute, the chairman or the vice-chairman of the State Board, and the rector or vice-rector of the governing board of each other public institution of higher education to be a resident of the Commonwealth. This bill is identical to SB 907.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; certain positions require residency of the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (59-Y 36-N) (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE:REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (30-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (60-Y 38-N) (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE:REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (30-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (60-Y 38-N) (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0764) | |
2017-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 764 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1402ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (59-Y 36-N) |
2017-02-24 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (59-Y 36-N) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N) |
2017-02-24 | House | Conference substitute printed 17105749D-H2 |
2017-02-24 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senators: Surovell, Saslaw, Peake |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | Delegates: Landes, Lingamfelter, Hester |
2017-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2017-02-23 | House | House acceded to request |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE:REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 17105458D-S1 (0-Y 95-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (26-Y 14-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (30-Y 9-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1402S1 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105458D-S1 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105458D-S1 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (60-Y 38-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (60-Y 38-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1402H1 |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104390D-H1 |
2017-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104390D-H1 |
2017-01-25 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (15-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2016-09-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-09-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100216D |
Subjects
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Virginia Military Institute
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Virginia Military Institute