VA HB1400 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - (67 affirmative votes required to override)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Virtual School established. Establishes the Board of the Virginia Virtual School (the Board) as a policy agency in the executive branch of state government for the purpose of governing the full-time virtual school programs offered to students enrolled in the Virginia Virtual School (the School). The Secretary of Education is responsible for such agency. The 14-member Board is given operational control of the School and assigned powers and duties. Beginning with the 2019-2020 school year, the bill requires the School to be open to any school-age person in the Commonwealth and to provide an educational program meeting the Standards of Quality for grades kindergarten through 12, with a maximum enrollment of 5,000 students statewide. The bill requires the average state share of Standards of Quality per pupil funding for each enrolled student to be transferred to the School. This bill is identical to SB 1240.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Virtual School Board; established, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (58-Y 42-N) (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (7-Y 4-N) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 40-N) (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 6-N) (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05House(67 affirmative votes required to override)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (58-Y 42-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse sustained Governor's veto (58-Y 42-N)
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-13 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2017-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
2017-02-24SenateSigned by President
2017-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1400ER)
2017-02-24HouseEnrolled
2017-02-21SenatePassed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
2017-02-21SenateRead third time
2017-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenateReported from Finance (7-Y 4-N)
2017-02-16SenateRereferred to Finance
2017-02-16SenateReported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N)
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2017-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-07HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 40-N)
2017-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (57-Y 40-N)
2017-02-06HouseRead second time and engrossed
2017-02-03HouseRead first time
2017-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations (12-Y 6-N)
2017-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N)
2017-01-30HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2017-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-30HouseReported from Education (14-Y 7-N)
2017-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
2017-01-20HouseAssigned Education sub: Education Innovation
2016-08-31HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2016-08-31HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100178D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22208(n/a)See Bill Text
222101(n/a)See Bill Text
221212.23(n/a)See Bill Text
221253.13:2(n/a)See Bill Text
221349.12(n/a)See Bill Text
221349.16(n/a)See Bill Text
2311100(n/a)See Bill Text
581638(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1400
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1400+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1400ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0903V0009+HB1400
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H09V0111+HB1400
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0204V0002+HB1400
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H02V0030+HB1400
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2043+HB1400
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S04V0248+HB1400
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S05V0300+HB1400
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0735HB1400+HB1400
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0789HB1400+HB1400
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2856+HB1400

Bill Comments

feedback