VA HB140 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public employment; limitations on inquiries by state agencies and localities regarding criminal arrests, charges, or convictions. Prohibits state agencies and localities from including on any employment application a question inquiring whether the prospective employee has ever been arrested for, charged with, or convicted of any crime. A prospective employee may not be asked if he has ever been arrested or charged with or convicted of any crime unless the inquiry takes place during or after a staff interview of the prospective employee. The prohibition does not apply to applications for employment with law-enforcement agencies or positions related to law-enforcement agencies. The prohibition also does not apply to applications for state agency positions designated as sensitive or to state agencies that are expressly permitted to inquire into an individual's criminal arrests or charges for employment purposes pursuant to any provision of federal or state law.
Title
Public employment; limitations on inquiries by state agencies and localities regarding arrests.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Incorporated by General Laws |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB757-Aird) by voice vote |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Adminstrative Process |
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-12-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101346D |
Same As/Similar To
HB757 (Similar To) 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0422)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1505.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2812.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB140 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB140+hil |