VA HB1391 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Unemployment compensation; overtime compensation. Excludes from the definition of wages any part of the individual's remuneration paid as overtime compensation required by §207 of the federal Fair Labor Standards Act. The exclusion applies only for purposes of computing the weekly benefit amount based on an individual's earned wages for insured work subsequent to December 31, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unemployment compensation; overtime compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Commerce and Labor
2018-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-25HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-15HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-01-15HousePresented and ordered printed 18104438D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
602229(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback