VA HB139 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Human Rights Act; pregnancy, childbirth, or related medical conditions; causes of action. Provides that no employer may discharge any employee on the basis of pregnancy, childbirth, or related medical conditions, including lactation. Currently, the protection against discrimination on the basis of pregnancy, childbirth, or related medical conditions applies to an employer employing more than five but fewer than 15 persons.
Title
Virginia Human Rights Act; pregnancy, childbirth, or related medical conditions, causes of action.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in General Laws |
2016-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2015-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-12-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101932D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB139 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB139+hil |