VA HB1377 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0149)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0149)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Soybean Board; assessment from sale of soybeans. Changes the amount of the assessment for research, education, publicity, and the promotion of the sale and use of soybeans, currently at $0.02 per bushel, to a rate of one half of one percent of the net market price per bushel.
Title
Soybean Board; assessment from sale of soybeans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0149) | |
2024-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 149 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1377ER) |
2024-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2024-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24104222D |