VA HB1374 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-07 - Stricken from docket by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Sewerage systems; state adoption of federal criteria; ammonia. Directs the State Water Control Board not to adopt certain U.S. Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) freshwater ammonia water quality criteria (the Criteria) until all other states in EPA Regions III and IV have done so, unless the EPA Administrator informs the Commonwealth in writing that such timing is unlawful under the federal Clean Water Act. The bill also directs the Department of Environmental Quality to (i) identify any other states that have adopted the Criteria as of July 1, 2018; (ii) identify those procedures for the implementation of the Criteria that will minimize the impact of such implementation on Virginia sewerage systems while complying with the Clean Water Act; and (iii) report its findings to the Chairmen of the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources, the House Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources, the Senate Finance Committee, and the House Appropriations Committee by November 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Sewerage systems; state adoption of federal criteria, ammonia.


Roll Calls


2018-02-07HouseStricken from docket by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2018-01-12HousePresented and ordered printed 18104995D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62144.15:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

Bill Comments