VA HB137 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0367)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0367)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Capital Region Airport Commission. Authorizes Capital Region Airport Commission. Authorizes the Capital Region Airport Commission to (i) make charitable donations to organizations and (ii) form or support independent foundations designed to foster an appreciation by the public of the importance of aviation, assist the public in aviation travel, or help develop and educate the next generation of aviation professionals in the Commonwealth. The bill provides that any such foundation is not a public body and is exempt from the provisions of the Virginia Public Procurement Act and the Virginia Freedom of Information Act. The bill also authorizes the Commission to indemnify any current or former Commissioner, officer, employee, or agent of the Commission against liability arising from such position.
Title
Capital Region Airport Commission; authorized to make charitable donations to organizations, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0367) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 367 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB137ER) |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-09 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100651D |
Same As/Similar To
SB478 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0368)
SB478 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0368)
SB478 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0368)