VA HB137 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0430)
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0430)
Summary
Textbook purchasing contracts. Permits local school boards to enter into contracts with publishers for the purchase of textbooks. The bill expands the definition of textbook to include print and electronic media. The bill reorganizes the textbook purchasing process and repeals several sections of outdated code. Also provides that if consumable materials are sold to students, the local school board must provide those materials at a reduced price, or free of charge, to students who are unable to afford them. This bill is identical to
Title
Textbook purchases; permits local school boards to enter into contracts with publishers.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] | Del. Anne Crockett-Stark [R] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Del. James Massie [R] |
Del. Joe May [R] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Del. Samuel Nixon [R] | Del. Christopher Peace [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0430) | |
2008-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 430 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-29 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-29 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB137ER) | |
2008-02-29 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-27 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-26 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-28 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB137H1 | |
2008-01-25 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 083359676-H1 | |
2008-01-25 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-24 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-23 | House: Committee substitute printed 083359676-H1 | |
2008-01-23 | House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 0-N) | |
2007-12-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2007-12-20 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087917676 |
Same As/Similar To
SB356 (Same As) 2010-02-16 - Senate: Left in Courts of Justice
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB137 |