VA HB1363 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removal of certain local officers; petition requirements. Clarifies that the petition to remove a county supervisor, city council member, or member of a school board shall contain the signatures of a number of registered voters who reside within the jurisdiction of such officer equal to 10 percent of the amount that results when the total number of votes cast at the last election for the board or council is divided by the number of officers elected to the board or council at that election.
Title
Local officers; petition requirements for removal of county supervisor, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2016-02-12 | House | Continued to 2017 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2016-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaigns |
2016-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-01-22 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16102057D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1363 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1363+hil |