VA HB136 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - Passed by indefinitely in Rehabilitation and Social Services (7-Y 4-N 2-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - Passed by indefinitely in Rehabilitation and Social Services (7-Y 4-N 2-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; annual mixed beverage special events licenses. Allows annual mixed beverage special events licenses to be issued to localities for use at special events conducted on the premises of a museum for historic interpretation that is owned and operated by the locality.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; annual mixed beverage special events licenses for museums.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Rehabilitation and Social Services (7-Y 4-N 2-A) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Rehabilitation and Social Services (7-Y 4-N 2-A) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Recommitted to Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-31 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2018-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2018-01-30 | House | Printed as engrossed 18102765D-E |
2018-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB136E |
2018-01-30 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-25 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-12-19 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-12-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102765D |