VA HB1359 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Concealed handgun permits; lifetime permits. Provides for the issuance of concealed handgun permits for Virginia residents that do not expire. Currently, such permits must be renewed every five years.
Title
Concealed handgun permits; lifetime permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2015-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-12-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2014-12-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101524D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.010 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.011 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1359 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1359+hil |