VA HB1359 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - House: Incorporated by Finance (HB2-Loupassi) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - House: Incorporated by Finance (HB2-Loupassi) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; Small business investment tax credit. Establishes a tax credit for investments in machinery or equipment by small businesses. The credit would equal 20 percent of investment amount. The Department of Taxation would administer the tax credits. Taxpayers would not be allowed more than $10,000 in tax credit for any taxable year in which an incremental investment in machinery or equipment was made. Any unused tax credit would be allowed to be carried forward for five taxable years. The credit would be effective for taxable years 2010, 2011, and 2012.
Title
Income tax, corporate; tax credit for investments in machinery or equipment by small businesses.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | House: Incorporated by Finance (HB2-Loupassi) by voice vote | |
2010-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB2-Loupassi) by voice vote | |
2010-01-26 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #3 | |
2010-01-22 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-22 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10103222D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB1359 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1359+hil |