VA HB1358 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0521)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0521)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Claims; Jervon Michael Tillman; compensation for wrongful incarceration. Provides relief in the amount of $408,205 to Jervon Michael Tillman, who was wrongly convicted of robbery, wearing a mask, and use of a firearm in the commission of a felony. Claims; Jervon Michael Tillman; compensation for wrongful incarceration. Provides relief in the amount of $408,205 to Jervon Michael Tillman, who was wrongly convicted of robbery, wearing a mask, and use of a firearm in the commission of a felony.
Title
Relief; Tillman, Jervon Michael.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (1-Y 96-N) (Y: 1 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (1-Y 96-N) (Y: 1 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0521) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 521 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1358ER) |
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-12 | House | VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-12 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-12 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Lucas, Edwards, Pillion |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Sullivan, Bloxom, Bell |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-10 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Rejected (1-Y 96-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 22107212D-S1 (1-Y 96-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1358S1 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22107212D-S1 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22107212D-S1 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Printed as engrossed 22104911D-E |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1358E |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government and Capital Outlay |
2022-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-24 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104911D |
2022-01-24 | House | Unanimous consent to introduce |