VA HB1351 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0857)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Joint legal or physical child custody. Provides that the court shall consider and may award joint legal, joint physical, or sole custody of a child and there shall be no presumption in favor of any such form of custody.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint legal, joint physical, or sole child custody; court shall consider and may award.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N 1-A) (Y: 1 N: 96 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0857)
2018-05-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 857 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-05-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 18, 2018
2018-04-18HouseCommunicated to Governor
2018-04-18HouseSpeaker ruled Governor's recommendation not germane
2018-04-09HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2018-03-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President
2018-03-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1351ER)
2018-03-20HouseEnrolled
2018-03-09SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-09HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-09HouseConference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-09HouseConference substitute printed 18108218D-H2
2018-03-09 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2018-03-08SenateSenators: Stuart, Obenshain, Deeds
2018-03-08SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-03-07HouseDelegates: Davis, Collins, Hope
2018-03-07HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-03-07HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-03-06SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-03-06SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N 1-A)
2018-03-05HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 18107649D-S1 (1-Y 96-N 1-A)
2018-03-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-01SenatePassed Senate with substitute (38-Y 2-N)
2018-03-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1351S1
2018-03-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107649D-S1
2018-03-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-03-01SenateRead third time
2018-02-28SenatePassed by for the day
2018-02-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107649D-S1
2018-02-26SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-02HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1351H1
2018-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18105759D-H1
2018-02-01HouseRead second time
2018-01-31HouseRead first time
2018-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 18105759D-H1
2018-01-29HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2018-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-18HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-11HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-11HousePresented and ordered printed 18104543D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1351
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1351+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1351H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1351S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1351H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1351ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0857+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0802V0029+HB1351
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H08V0028+HB1351
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0276+HB1351
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S03V0368+HB1351
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0741HB1351+HB1351
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0811HB1351+HB1351
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1290+HB1351
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0942HB1351+HB1351
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1540+HB1351
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1179HB1351+HB1351

Bill Comments

feedback