VA HB135 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Home-produced or farm-produced products. Allows the sale of food products made from any fruit, grain, herbs, honey, meat, milk, mushrooms, nuts, poultry, seafood, or vegetables by a farm operation employing 10 or fewer people or by a private home, so long as (i) the sale is made directly to consumers and (ii) the product is labeled with the producer's name and address, the product's ingredients, and a disclosure statement indicating the product is not subject to Virginia's food safety laws or regulations.
Title
Home-produced or farm-produced products; sale of products by certain farm operations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-13 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Agriculture |
2013-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2013-12-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100017D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 5101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 5130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 5206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB135 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB135+hil |