VA HB1343 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - House: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - House: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Tracking of ephedrine and pseudoephedrine; pilot program. Requires the Board of Pharmacy, in conjunction with local law-enforcement officials, to establish a mandatory pilot program in the Counties of Page, Clarke, Frederick, Rockingham, Shenandoah, and Warren to implement an electronic recordkeeping system of the transactions involving the distribution of ephedrine and pseudoephedrine as required by state law. This bill is contingent upon funds being provided by a third party or agency, such that there will be no cost to participating pharmacies.
Title
Ephedrine and pseudoephedrine; Board of Pharmacy to establish program to implement tracking sales.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | House: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2010-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-01-27 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2010-01-22 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-22 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10104259D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB1343 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1343+hil |