VA HB1340 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0592)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0592)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revision of Title 55. Makes technical amendments relating to the revision and recodification of Title 55 enacted in the 2019 Session. The bill also implements clarifying changes and other changes made in the revision and recodification. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Code Commission.
Title
Revision of Title 55; technical amendments relating to the revision and recodification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0592) | |
2020-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 592 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2020 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1340ER) |
2020-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1340H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107189D-H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107189D-H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100317D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2345 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1808 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1810 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1911 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1919 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1937 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |