VA HB132 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electronic filing of search warrant affidavits. Allows for the electronic filing of search warrant affidavits by use of portable document format (PDF) in addition to the currently authorized electronic facsimile submission.
Title
Affidavits; allows for electronic filing of search warrant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-30 | House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2012-01-16 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2012-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100530D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB132 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB132+hil |