VA HB132 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715)
Summary
Parking in spaces reserved for persons with disabilities; local ordinances. Provides that the governing body of any city, county, or town may, by ordinance, provide for a lesser fine if there is a placard within a vehicle utilizing a parking space reserved for persons with disabilities, but that placard is not appropriately displayed.
Title
Handicap placards; fine for inappropriately displaying when parking in space for handicapped.
Sponsors
Del. Onzlee Ware [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 715 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-06 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-06 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB132ER) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-30 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-30 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N) | |
2008-01-30 | House: Read third time and passed House (94-Y 5-N) | |
2008-01-29 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2008-01-29 | House: Pending question ordered | |
2008-01-29 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-28 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-25 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 2-N) | |
2007-12-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2007-12-20 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081046776 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB132 |