VA HB1315 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Elected officials; Internet publication of personal information; definition of public official. Adds to the definition of "public official" any elected official for the purposes of prohibiting the Commonwealth from publishing on the Internet the personal information of any public official if a court has ordered that such official's personal information is prohibited from publication and the official has made a demand in writing to the Commonwealth, accompanied by the order of the court, that the Commonwealth not publish such information. The bill provides that such written demand made by an elected official is effective for four years if such elected official continuously serves throughout the four-year period.
Title
Elected officials; Internet publication of personal information, definition of public official.
Sponsors
Del. Wendell Walker [R] | Del. Chad Green [R] | Del. Eric Zehr [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-28 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24104578D |