VA HB1314 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Student eligibility for in-state tuition at public institutions of higher education; state subsidy. Requires the General Assembly, in the event that it amends any provision of law to increase the number of students who are eligible for in-state tuition at public institutions of higher education despite not being domiciled in the Commonwealth pursuant to §23-7.4, to (i) reimburse each institution in an amount equal to the difference between the in-state tuition rate and out-of-state tuition rate for each student who becomes eligible as a result of the amendments and (ii) fund the educational and general programs of each institution at a level equal to or greater than the highest level of funding for educational and general programs in the preceding three years.
Title
Student eligibility for in-state tuition at public institutions of higher education; state subsidy.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2014-11-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-11-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100128D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1314 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1314+hil |