VA HB1313 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Chief Resilience Officer. Directs the Governor to designate a Chief Resilience Officer to serve as the primary coordinator of resilience and adaptation initiatives in Virginia and as the primary point of contact regarding issues related to resilience and recurrent flooding. The bill directs the Chief Resilience Officer, in consultation with the Special Assistant to the Governor for Coastal Adaptation and Protection, to identify and monitor areas at the greatest risk from recurrent flooding; review and comment on plans for the construction or substantial reinforcement of a substantial flood defense or catchment area, at the request of the locality containing such defense or area; and initiate and assist with the pursuit of funding for resilience initiatives. The bill also expands the list of programs with which localities and the Commonwealth are required to coordinate as part of their flood control efforts.
Title
Chief Resilience Officer; Governor to designate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (34-Y 3-N) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (34-Y 3-N) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493) | |
2020-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 493 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1313ER) |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-02 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (34-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 20107303D-EH1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1313EH1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee on Appropriations amendments agreed to |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources substitute agreed to 20107303D-H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107303D-H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103145D |