VA HB131 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0018)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0018)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tax contributions for restoration of the Chesapeake Bay. Requires the Secretary of Natural Resources to submit a report to the committees of oversight and the Virginia delegation to the Chesapeake Bay Commission by November 1 of each year describing how the moneys from the voluntary income tax check-off for Chesapeake Bay restoration activities were expended. The bill requires the report to be posted on a website maintained by the Secretary of Natural Resources, along with a cumulative listing of previous grants, beginning with awards granted on or after July 1, 2014.
Title
Chesapeake Bay; voluntary tax contributions for restoration, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0018) | |
2014-02-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 18 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB131ER) |
2014-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Printed as engrossed 14100853D-E |
2014-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB131E |
2014-01-22 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-20 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-13 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2013-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-12-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100853D |
Same As/Similar To
SB414 (Same As) 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0182)
Subjects
Administration of Government
Chesapeake Bay
Computer Services and Uses
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Taxation
Chesapeake Bay
Computer Services and Uses
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Taxation