VA HB13 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Instructional positions; students identified as having limited English proficiency. Requires state funding to be provided pursuant to the general appropriation act to support 20 full-time equivalent instructional positions for each 1,000 students identified as having limited English proficiency. Current law requires state funding to support 17 such positions for each 1,000 such students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Instructional positions; students identified as having limited English proficiency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Appropriations
2018-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-05HouseReported from Education (21-Y 1-N)
2018-02-05HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2018-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2018-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-11-20HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2017-11-20HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100647D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback