VA HB129 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Maximum allowable rates of special regulatory taxes; public service companies. Increases the maximum allowable rates of several taxes, known as special regulatory taxes, that apply to public service companies such as those that provide water, heat, light, or power. The bill increases the maximum allowable rate of the gross receipts tax from 0.2 percent to 0.26 percent, increases the maximum allowable rates of three electricity consumption taxes that are measured per kilowatt hour, and increases the maximum allowable rate of the natural gas consumption tax from $0.0020 per cubic foot to $0.0026 per cubic foot.
Title
Public service companies; increases max. allowable rates of special reg. taxes that can be imposed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 14-N 1-A) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 697 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB129ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (25-Y 14-N 1-A) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (58-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-12-16 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102148D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 2660 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |