VA HB129 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; retail competition; purchases from net metering sellers. Authorizes individual retail customers who are eligible customer-generators under Virginia's net energy metering program to purchase electricity provided 100 percent from renewable energy exclusively for their own consumption from a net metering seller. A net metering seller is a person, other than a utility or licensed supplier, that owns or operates a renewable energy electricity generation source on premises that is owned, leased, or otherwise controlled by an eligible customer-generator and sells the electricity generated from the renewable generation source exclusively to the eligible customer-generator under a power purchase agreement. This exception to the incumbent electric utility's exclusive service territory applies even if the utility offers an approved tariff for electric energy provided 100 percent from renewable energy.
Title
Electric utilities; purchases from net metering sellers.
Sponsors
Del. Anne Crockett-Stark [R] | Del. Terry Kilgore [R] | Sen. Lynwood Lewis [D] | Del. Luke Torian [D] |
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-30 | Senate | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Continued to 2013 in Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 12105441D-S1 |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2012-02-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2012-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2012-02-03 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2012-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2012-01-31 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) |
2012-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) |
2012-01-17 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy |
2012-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2012-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101947D |