VA HB1285 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0646)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0646)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certificate of public need; public notice. Clarifies the role of the Department of Health regarding public hearings, including public notification of a public hearing, for applications for certificates of public need in cases in which a regional health planning agency has not been designated.
Title
Certificate of public need; Department of Health to provide public notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0646) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 646 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-10 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1285ER) | |
2010-03-10 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-03 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Licensing | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-02 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-29 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-28 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-21 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-01-21 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10104213D |