VA HB1270 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Companion animal care advisory committee established. Authorizes the State Veterinarian to establish by January 1, 2017, a seven-member advisory committee to make recommendations and serve as a resource in the development of policies related to the care and treatment of companion animals by public and private animal shelters.
Title
Companion animal care advisory committee; State Veterinarian to establish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (9-Y 30-N) (Y: 9 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (9-Y 30-N) (Y: 9 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | Senate | Left in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Recommitted to Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (9-Y 30-N) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (8-Y 7-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-08 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | House | Printed as engrossed 16104235D-E |
2016-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1270E |
2016-02-05 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16104235D |