VA HB1266 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Local school board; annual report. Requires that the form provided by the Superintendent of Public Instruction to local school divisions for the purposes of the annual report, include (i) total expenditure per student; (ii) transportation cost per student mile; (iii) operation and maintenance cost per student and per square foot of schools and offices; (iv) energy cost per student and per square foot of schools and offices; and (v) custodial costs per student and per square foot of schools and offices.
Title
School board, local; annual report.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Gear [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Education | |
2010-02-04 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-01-26 | House: Assigned Education sub: #3 Teachers and Admin. Action | |
2010-01-19 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-01-19 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10104110D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB1266 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1266+hil |