VA HB1265 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0282)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Education preparation programs; reading specialists; dyslexia. Requires each education preparation program offered by a public institution of higher education or private institution of higher education that leads to a degree, concentration, or certificate for reading specialists to include a program of coursework or other training in the identification of and the appropriate interventions, accommodations, and teaching techniques for students with dyslexia or a related disorder. The bill requires such programs to (i) include coursework in the constructs and pedagogy underlying remediation of reading, spelling, and writing and (ii) require reading specialists to demonstrate mastery of an evidence-based, structured literacy instructional approach that includes explicit, systematic, sequential, and cumulative instruction. This bill is identical to SB 368.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education preparation programs; reading specialists, dyslexia.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0282)
2018-03-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 282 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
2018-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
2018-02-28SenateSigned by President
2018-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1265ER)
2018-02-26HouseEnrolled
2018-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-21HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 18107296D-S2 (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-19SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB1265S2
2018-02-19SenateSubstitute by Senator Newman agreed to 18107296D-S2
2018-02-19SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-19SenateFloor substitute printed 18107296D-S2 (Newman)
2018-02-19SenateCommittee substitute rejected 18107215D-S1
2018-02-19SenateCommittee substitute reconsidered (39-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107215D-S1
2018-02-19SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-19SenateRead third time
2018-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-15SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107215D-S1
2018-02-15SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-06HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1265H1
2018-02-05HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18106288D-H1
2018-02-05HouseRead second time
2018-02-02HouseRead first time
2018-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 18106288D-H1
2018-01-31HouseReported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2018-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103455D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231902(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1265
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1265+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1265H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1265S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1265S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1265ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0282+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0903V0010+HB1265
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H09V0041+HB1265
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0369+HB1265
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S04V0218+HB1265
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0539HB1265+HB1265
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0562HB1265+HB1265
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0563HB1265+HB1265
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0914+HB1265

Bill Comments

feedback