VA HB1261 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Energy efficiency programs. Provides that an energy efficiency program proposed by an electric utility is in the public interest if the net present value of the benefits exceeds the net present value of the costs as determined by any three of four benefit cost tests. The four tests to be considered are the Total Resource Cost Test, the Utility Cost Test, the Participant Test, and the Ratepayer Impact Measure Test. The measure also revises the existing standard for what constitutes a cost-effective conservation and energy efficiency program conducted by a natural gas utility to conform to the provisions for electric utilities.
Title
Energy efficiency programs; programs proposed by an electric utility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1558-Kilgore) by voice vote |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104322D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1261 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1261+hil |