VA HB1261 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0228)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0228)
Summary
Individual income tax withholding. Repeals provisions that have never been implemented allowing additional withholding exemptions.
Title
Income tax, state; repeals provisions allowing additional withholding exemptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0228) | |
2008-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 228 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-25 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1261ER) | |
2008-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-31 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-31 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-30 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-29 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-28 | House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-15 | House: Assigned Finance sub: 2 | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086338818 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1261 |