VA HB1255 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1229)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Standards and criteria for congressional and state legislative districts. Provides criteria by which congressional and state legislative districts are to be drawn. Such criteria include equal population requirements, with a deviation of no more than five percent permitted for state legislative districts; compliance with laws and judicial decisions relating to racial and ethnic fairness; preservation of communities of interest, which are defined to mean a neighborhood or any geographically defined group of people living in an area who share similar social, cultural, and economic interests; and compactness and contiguity. The bill also includes provisions of the Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended, related to redistricting, that prohibit the drawing of districts in ways that improperly dilute minority populations' voting power. The bill prohibits maps of districts, when considered on a statewide basis, from unduly favoring or disfavoring any political party. The bill further provides for the preparation and use of adjusted population data for redistricting and reapportionment purposes to reflect the reallocation of persons incarcerated in federal, state, and local correctional facilities. Persons incarcerated in such a facility whose address at the time of incarceration was in the Commonwealth are to be counted at that address and persons incarcerated in such a facility whose address at the time of incarceration was outside of the Commonwealth or cannot be determined are to be counted at the facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congressional and state legislative districts; standards and criteria.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (50-Y 43-N) (Y: 50 N: 42 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1229)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1229 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled bill text (HB1255ER2)
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N)
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (50-Y 43-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (50-Y 43-N)
2020-04-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-04-08HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2020-03-17 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-17HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020
2020-03-12SenateSigned by President
2020-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-12HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1255ER)
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Adoption (54-Y 45-N)
2020-03-05HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 20108189D-S1 (54-Y 45-N)
2020-03-05SenatePassed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N)
2020-03-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1255S1
2020-03-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108189D-S1
2020-03-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-03-05SenateRead third time
2020-03-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-25SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108189D-S1
2020-02-25SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1255H1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107097D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseIncorporates H1054 (Levine)
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107097D-H1
2020-02-07HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
2020-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05HouseAssigned P & E sub: Redistricting
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100641D

Same As/Similar To

SB717 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1265)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242304.04(n/a)See Bill Text
242304.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1255&201+sum+HB1255
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1255+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1255H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1255S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1255ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1255ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1229+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1805V0005+HB1255
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H18V0095+HB1255
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0824+HB1255
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S08V0156+HB1255
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0495+HB1255
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1529HB1255+HB1255
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1606HB1255+HB1255
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1923+HB1255
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2034HB1255+HB1255
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2179+HB1255

Bill Comments

feedback