VA HB1251 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0677)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0677)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sex offenders; reregistration; name change. Provides that a person required to register with the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry must reregister in person with the local law-enforcement agency within three days following a change of the person's name and that a person who is incarcerated or civilly committed must notify the Registry within three days following a name change. Currently, there is no time specified for when such person has to reregister. The bill also requires that the information contained in the Registry must include any former name of a person required to register if he has lawfully changed his name during the period for which he is required to register. Persons required to register who have changed their name prior to July 1, 2014, who have not already reregistered following their name change, must register within three days of July 1, 2014.
Title
Sex offenders; reregistration, name change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0677) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 677 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1251ER) |
2014-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 14103584D-E |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1251E |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103584D |