VA HB1250 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0315)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0315)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vested rights. Provides that the issuance of any written order, requirement, decision, or determination by the zoning administrator regarding the permissibility of a specific use or density of the landowner's property that is no longer subject to change, modification, or reversal shall be considered a significant affirmative governmental act for purposes of determining vested rights.
Title
Vested rights; issuance of written order, etc., by zoning administrator regarding use of property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0315) | |
2010-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 315 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1250ER) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-12 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) | |
2010-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House (92-Y 4-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1250H1 | |
2010-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104956D-H1 | |
2010-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104956D-H1 | |
2010-02-08 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (18-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-04 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2010-01-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2010-01-18 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10103138D |