VA HB1241 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Motor fuels tax; indexed. Requires that the motor fuels tax rate be indexed on January 1, 2014, and each year thereafter, to the average percentage change in the U.S. Department of Transportation's Transportation Services Index for the three years ending October 31 of the year immediately preceding the affected year.
Title
Motor fuels tax; required to be indexed starting on January 1, 2014.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Finance | |
2012-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-24 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2012-01-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-20 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12104071D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 2217 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2249 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2289 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB1241 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB1241+hil |