VA HB124 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0137)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0137)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Corporation Commission; annual report filing requirements. Permits a person authorized by a domestic or foreign stock or nonstock corporation to sign the annual report of such corporation for purposes of the Virginia Stock Corporation Act and the Virginia Nonstock Corporation Act.
Title
State Corporation Commission; annual report filing requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0137) | |
2024-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 137 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB124ER) |
2024-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-01-22 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-16 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102614D |