VA HB1236 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Lane filtering; motorcycles. Authorizes the operator of a two-wheeled motorcycle to pass another vehicle that is stopped or traveling at no more than 10 miles per hour in the same lane, provided that there are at least two lanes of travel in each direction, such motorcycle does not exceed a speed of 20 miles per hour, and the operator executes such passing safely.
Title
Lane filtering; motorcycles.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Transportation |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102834D |