VA HB1232 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1232
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Continued to 2023 in Rules (13-Y 3-N)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Continued to 2023 in Rules (13-Y 3-N)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Behavioral Health Commission; membership. Adds two nonlegislative citizen members who have received or are receiving services from the Commonwealth's behavioral health system, one nonlegislative citizen member who is a local law-enforcement officer serving a jurisdiction located in the Commonwealth, one nonlegislative citizen member who is a behavioral health services provider providing services in the Commonwealth, and one nonlegislative citizen member who is a certified peer recovery specialist or registered peer recovery specialist to the membership of the Behavioral Health Commission.
Title
Behavioral Health Commission; increases membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2023 in Rules (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 3-N) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 3-N) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Continued to 2023 in Rules (13-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government and Capital Outlay |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported from Rules (15-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22103866D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1232 (Carry Over) 2022-03-04 - Continued to 2023 in Rules (13-Y 3-N)
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
General Assembly
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
General Assembly