VA HB1231 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0757)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Dogs injuring or killing poultry. Allows the district court to order that any dog that has been found to have injured or killed only poultry be microchipped and either confined securely or transferred to another owner whom the court deems appropriate. Under current law, the court is required to order that such a dog be killed immediately or removed to another state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dogs chasing livestock; district court may order dog to be transferred to a different owner, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 11-N) (Y: 88 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N) (Y: 84 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-20 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0757)
2016-04-20HouseEnacted, Chapter 757 (effective 7/1/16)
2016-04-20SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2016-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2016-04-20HouseReenrolled bill text (HB1231ER2)
2016-04-20HouseReenrolled
2016-04-20 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2016-04-20SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N)
2016-04-20HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N)
2016-04-20HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 4-N)
2016-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-03-29HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2016-03-08 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
2016-03-08HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/8/2016
2016-03-07SenateSigned by President
2016-03-04HouseSigned by Speaker
2016-03-04HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1231ER)
2016-03-04HouseEnrolled
2016-03-03HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 11-N)
2016-03-03HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (86-Y 11-N)
2016-03-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-03-01SenatePassed Senate with amendments (35-Y 3-N)
2016-03-01SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2016-03-01SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2016-03-01SenateReading of amendments waived
2016-03-01SenateRead third time
2016-02-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2016-02-25SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 1-N)
2016-02-16SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2016-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2016-02-15HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N)
2016-02-15HouseRead third time and passed House (82-Y 17-N)
2016-02-12HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1231H1
2016-02-12HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 16105380D-H1
2016-02-12HouseRead second time
2016-02-11HouseRead first time
2016-02-10HouseCommittee substitute printed 16105380D-H1
2016-02-10HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 7-N)
2016-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 2-N)
2016-01-25HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
2016-01-19HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2016-01-19HousePresented and ordered printed 16104040D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326552(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB1231
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB1231+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB1231H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB1231ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB1231ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+CHAP0757+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H0101V0016+HB1231
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H01V0036+HB1231
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV0529+HB1231
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+S01V0084+HB1231
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0718HB1231+HB1231
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0753HB1231+HB1231
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV1156+HB1231
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV1436+HB1231
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV1182HB1231+HB1231

Bill Comments

feedback