VA HB1230 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Certificate of public need; determination of need. Provides that, for the purpose of determining public need for a proposed project in cases in which a provider or affiliated group of providers holds a market share of 55 percent or more for a type of service or medical care facility in a planning district, a proposed project involving the same type of service or medical care facility in the same planning district shall be presumed to be a project that fosters institutional competition that benefits the area to be served while improving access to essential health care services for all persons in the area to be served, absent evidence to the contrary. The bill also provides that, for the purpose of determining public need for a proposed project in cases in which a provider or affiliated group of providers holds a market share of 85 percent or more, the proposed project shall be deemed to be a project that fosters institutional competition that benefits the area to be served while improving access to essential health care services for all persons in the area to be served.
Title
Certificate of public need; criteria for determination of need.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103452D |