VA HB1230 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Certain school board employees; possession of firearms on school property. Permits any school board to authorize any school board employee to possess a firearm on school property, in addition to those individuals expressly authorized to possess such a firearm as otherwise provided in statute, provided that any school board employee so authorized by the school board receives advanced firearms training in accordance with criteria established by the Department of Criminal Justice Services. The bill requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services to develop and distribute to each local school board such criteria no later than August 1, 2024.
Title
School board employees, certain; possession of firearms on school property.
Sponsors
Del. Eric Zehr [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Public Safety |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned PS sub: Firearms |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102525D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 280.2:4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |